EP0805191 - Recording liquid containing carbon black [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashi, Hirasa c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 02 /
Masahiro, Yamada c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 03 /
Makoto, Ishizu c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., Chigasaki Plant 370, Enzo Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253 / JP | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107075.0 | 29.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | JP19960109469 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10946996 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805191 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805191 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805191 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C09D11/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Russhaltige Aufzeichnungsflüssigkeit | [1997/45] | English: | Recording liquid containing carbon black | [1997/45] | French: | Liquide d'enregistrement contenant du noir de carbone | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH07331141 ; | US5538548 [ ] (YAMAZAKI HIDETO [JP]) [ ] * comparative example 2 *; | [AD]JPH03134073 ; | [A]EP0429828 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1; | [D]JPH03210373 (CANON KK) | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07331141 A 19951219 (BROTHER IND LTD) [XD] 1,4,7-14 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910903), vol. 015, no. 345, Database accession no. (C - 0864), & JP03134073 A 19910607 (CANON INC) [AD] 1 * abstract * |