EP0805434 - Method and system for speech recognition using continuous density hidden Markov models [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Xuedong D. 10026 - 177th Avenue N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Mahajan, Milind V. 16624 N.E. 34th Court No. SS302, Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107116.2 | 29.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | US19960655273 | 01.05.1996 Original published format: US 655273 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805434 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805434 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805434 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/14 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G10L15/144 (EP,US);
G06F18/295 (EP,US);
G10L15/187 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | G06K9/68, G10L15/14 | ||
Former IPC [1997/45] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Spracherkennung mittels verborgener Markoff-Modelle mit kontinuierlichen Ausgangswahrscheinlichkeiten | [1997/45] | English: | Method and system for speech recognition using continuous density hidden Markov models | [1997/45] | French: | Procédé et système de reconnaissance de la parole utilisant des modèles Markoviens cachés à densité de probabilités continue | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4587670 (LEVINSON STEPHEN E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,12,17,18 * abstract ** column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 5 *; | [X]EP0706171 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - line 50 *; | [PX] - HUANG X D ET AL, "Deleted interpolation and density sharing for continuous hidden Markov models", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002069616 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document * | [ ] - 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.96CH35903), 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, ATLANTA, GA, USA, 7-10 M, ISBN 0-7803-3192-3, 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 885 - 888 vol. 2, XP002069650 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1996.543263 | [X] - KOMORI Y ET AL, "AN EFFICIENT OUTPUT PROBABILITY COMPUTATION FOR CONTINUOUS HMM USING ROUGH AND DETAIL MODELS", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY (EUROSPEECH), (19950918), vol. 2, pages 1087 - 1090, XP000670819 [X] 1-3,5,6,12,17-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * | [A] - SANKAR A ET AL, "STOCHASTIC MATCHING FOR ROBUST SPEECH RECOGNITION", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (199408), vol. 1, no. 8, page 124/125, XP000474606 [A] 2,3,8,13,15,18,19 * abstract * * page 124, column R, line 11 - line 17 * * paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.311815 | [A] - WATANABE T ET AL, "HIGH SPEED SPEECH RECOGNITION USING TREE-STRUCTURED PROBABILITY DENSITY FUNCTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995 SPEECH, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950509), VOL. 1, pages 556 - 559, XP000658054 [A] 1,2,5,6,12,17,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479658 |