EP0875741 - Device for determining/monitoring of a predefined liquid level in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2008/34] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co.KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Getman, Igor, Prof. Goethestrasse 3 79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
Lopatin, Sergej, Dr. Freiburger Strasse 321-A 79539 Lörrach / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 97107154.3 | 30.04.1997 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875741 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875741 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/296 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G01F23/2967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Feststellung und/oder Überwachung eines vorbestimmten Füllstands in einem Behälter | [1998/45] | English: | Device for determining/monitoring of a predefined liquid level in a container | [1998/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la détermination et/ou la surveillance d'un niveau prédéterminé dans un réservoir | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.04.2009 | [2011/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS638582 ; | [A]DE3931453 ; | [A]DE4201360 (UWT APPARATE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE4402234 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]); | [DA]DE4419617 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]); | [A]DE4439879 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) |