EP0808085 - High frequency operating circuit with improved electromagnetic compatibility for low pressure discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franck, Felix, Dr. Gabelsbergerstrasse 48e 80333 München / DE | [1997/47] | Application number, filing date | 97107207.9 | 30.04.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996119581 | 15.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619581 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808085 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808085 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808085 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/28, H02M1/12 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
H05B41/295 (EP,US);
H05B45/355 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | H05B41/29, H02M1/12 | ||
Former IPC [1997/47] | H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/47] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzbetriebsschaltung für eine Niederdruckentladungslampe mit verbesserter elektromagnetischer Verträglichkeit | [1997/47] | English: | High frequency operating circuit with improved electromagnetic compatibility for low pressure discharge lamps | [1997/47] | French: | Alimentation à haute fréquence pour une lampe à décharge basse pression avec une compatibilité électromagnétique accrue | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Request for further processing for: | 16.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0253224 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9607297 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 17; figure 1 * |