blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0805025

EP0805025 - Device for conveying printed products between printing couples [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTG Lufttechnische GmbH
Wernerstrasse 119-129
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
LTG LUFTTECHNISCHE GMBH
Wernerstrasse 119-129
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klein, Albert K.
Eduard-Pfeifer-Strasse 82
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Grosse, Rainer, et al
Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Grosse, Rainer, et al
Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1997/45]Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwalt, Maybachstrasse 6A
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97107245.901.05.1997
[1997/45]
Priority number, dateDE199611750303.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19617503
[1997/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0805025
Date:05.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0805025
Date:07.01.1998
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805025
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1997
ClassificationIPC:B41F21/08, B41F7/16, B65H5/16, B65H5/02, B41F13/00, B41F21/00
[1997/50]
CPC:
B65H5/16 (EP,US); B41F13/00 (EP,US); B41F21/08 (EP,US);
B41F7/16 (EP,US); B65H2511/214 (EP,US)
C-Set:
B65H2511/214, B65H2220/04 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1997/45]B41F21/08, B41F7/16, B65H5/16, B65H5/02, B41F13/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1997/45]
TitleGerman:Druckgutfördervorrichtung zwischen Druckwerken[1997/45]
English:Device for conveying printed products between printing couples[1997/45]
French:Dispositif convoyeur des produits imprimés entre des groupes imprimants[1997/45]
Examination procedure12.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/28]
10.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE618260  (ALBERT SCHNELLPRESSEN) [Y] 1,3-7,13 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 7; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US3204557  (JAY WOLBERT HARRIS) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE1237533  (LEIPZIGER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINE) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4711172  (CAPDEBOSC BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1-15* siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0526677  (CORRADI S A [FR]) [A] 1-15 * siehe Zusammenfassung;; figures 1-4 *;
 [YA]EP0545862  (CROWN CORK & SEAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-8,13,15 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 5, line 52 - column 10, line 56; figures 2-4,9-11 * [A] 9-12,14;
 [Y]  - "Qualitätsanspruch im Blechdruck stark gestiegen: Trend zum Vierfarben-Raster- plus Schmuckfarbendruck", DEUTSCHER DRUCKER, (19921105), vol. 28, no. 41, pages w36 - w37, XP000311261 [Y] 8,15 * siehe das ganze Dokument *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.