EP0806492 - Substrate holder for vacuum coating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satis Vacuum Industries Vertriebs - AG Kohlrainstrasse 1 8700 Küsnacht / CH | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suter, Rudolf Stegenstrasse 22 6048 Horw / CH | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 97107376.2 | 05.05.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | CH19960001200 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: CH 120096 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806492 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806492 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/50 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
C23C14/505 (EP,US);
C23C14/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/46] | Title | German: | Substrat-Träger für vakuum-Beschichtungsanlagen | [1997/46] | English: | Substrate holder for vacuum coating apparatus | [1997/46] | French: | Porte-substrat pour dispositif de revêtement sous vide | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61130484 ; | [A]US3859956 (PAOLA CARL RALPH) |