EP0806273 - Method for producing injection moulded parts and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innova Kunststoffkorken Beck & Heimrich GbR. Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 7 97525 Schwebheim / DE | [2000/05] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Kessler, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing Karl-Oppel-Strasse 8 97525 Schwebheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Schwabe, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107443.0 | 06.05.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | DE1996118281 | 07.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19618281 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806273 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806273 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C45/04, B29C45/28 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
B29C45/2803 (EP);
B29C45/0433 (EP);
B29C45/14565 (EP);
B29C2045/14942 (EP);
B29L2031/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, PT [1997/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Spritzgussteilen sowie Vorrichtung hierfür | [1997/46] | English: | Method for producing injection moulded parts and apparatus therefor | [1997/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de pièces moulées par injection et dispositif approprié | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/01] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.02.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   28.02.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1035845 (L. MAZZONI) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,9,10,12; | [XY]FR1176153 (BRITISH INSULATED CALLENDER'S CABLES) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3,9,12; | [XY]FR2347756 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3,9,10,12; | [Y]EP0342237 (KANEKO MICHIO) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [YX]GB552031 (LESTER ENGINEERING CO.) [Y] 3 * figures 2,3; claim 1 * [X] 6-8; | [YX]US3446889 (DRAUDT DONALD A ET AL) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 2; figures 4-7 * [X] 6-8; | [A]DE3940461 (PFEFFERKORN & CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2248580 (L. H. MORIN) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document * |