Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1073671 | Global Dossier | 17.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CH116696 | 09.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0806712 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2002 | B1 | EP0806712 | 15.09.1999 | A3 | EP0806712 | 12.11.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH116696 | 09.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH689470 | 30.04.1999 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH116696 | 09.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59708103D1 | 10.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH116696 | 09.05.1996 |