EP0806712 - Mechanical watch-movement with incorporated chronometer movement (chronograph movement) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fortis AG Lindenstrasse 45 2540 Grenchen / CH | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerber, Paul Albisriederstrasse 307 8047 Zürich / CH | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | Rehmann, Klaus-Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107582.5 | 07.05.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | CH19960001166 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: CH 116696 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806712 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806712 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806712 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G04F7/08 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
G04B1/12 (EP);
G04B23/02 (EP);
G04F7/08 (EP);
G04F7/0895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/46] | Title | German: | Mechanisches Uhrwerk mit integrierter Stoppuhr (Chronographenwerk) | [1997/46] | English: | Mechanical watch-movement with incorporated chronometer movement (chronograph movement) | [1997/46] | French: | Mouvement d'horlogerie mécanique avec chronomètre incorporé (mouvement de chronographe) | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.09.2002 | GB | 04.09.2002 | IT | 04.09.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 04.09.2002 | |
GB | 04.09.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 04.09.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 28.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH508905 (BUEREN WATCH COMPANY S A [CH]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 28 - line 43; figure - *; | [A]CH319290 (BAUMGARTNER FRERES SA [CH]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US304234 (PORTEBOIS) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0493613 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 13, line 19 - line 31 * * column A * |