Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0808948 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2001 | B1 | EP0808948 | 08.07.1998 | A3 | EP0808948 | 26.11.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE207991T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH690368 | 15.08.2000 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59705138D1 | 06.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2166933T | 01.05.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5996972 | 07.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CH131896 | 24.05.1996 |