blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0878752

EP0878752 - Voltage regulation circuit for suppressing the "latch-up" effect [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.1999
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.02.2000 [2000/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EM Microelectronic-Marin SA
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[1998/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Ponzetta, Antonio Martino
Saules 6
2013 Colombier / CH
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert, et al
I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Balsters, Robert, et al
I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A., 7, rue des Sors
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date97107722.712.05.1997
[1998/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878752
Date:18.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1997
ClassificationIPC:G05F1/00, G05F1/575
[1998/47]
CPC:
G05F1/575 (EP,US); G05F1/00 (KR)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [1999/30]
Former [1998/47]AT,  DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:Spannungsregelung zur Unterdrückung des Latch-up Effekts[1998/47]
English:Voltage regulation circuit for suppressing the "latch-up" effect[1998/47]
French:Circuit de régulation de tension destiné à supprimer un phénomène dit "latch-up"[1998/47]
Examination procedure19.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/06]
10.09.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2000/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.06.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.1999DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.1999FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.1999GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.06.1999M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5212616  (DHONG SANG H [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2298939  (TOKO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - PREDIGER R ET AL, "BIPOLARE KONSTANTSTROMQUELLE QUERSTROM NACH BEDARF BEGRENZBAR", ELEKTRONIK, (19931019), vol. 42, no. 21, page 132/133, XP000402798 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANTHONY S.CHAMBERS, "Programmable D.C Power Supplies", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (196812), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 480 - 483, XP002044484 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.