EP0807514 - Elastomer coated layer for erosion and/or fire protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walla, Lisa A. 72 Karen Drive Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US | 02 /
Watson, Charles R. 60 Mary Catherine Circle Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. G.F. Hiebsch, Dipl.-Ing. K. Peege, Dipl.-Ing. N. Behrmann, Heinrich-Weber-Platz 1 78224 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107748.2 | 13.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | US19960645669 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: US 645669 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807514 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807514 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807514 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/42, // B29K21:00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
B29C70/40 (EP,US);
B29C70/467 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/246 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2631 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2861 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2902 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2926 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2984 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2992 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | Mit einem Elastomer beschichtetes Substrat für Erosion- und/oder Feuerschutz | [1997/47] | English: | Elastomer coated layer for erosion and/or fire protection | [1997/47] | French: | Couche enduit d'un élastomère pour la protection contre l'érosion et/ou le feu | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/47] | Couche enduit d'un élastomère pour la production contre l'érosion et/ou le feu | Examination procedure | 03.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 28.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0305052 (DOW CORNING KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-13 * page 3, lines 40-46; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4567320 (NEUROTH DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1,5,11 * column 3, lines 15-33 - column 4, lines 35-50 *; | [X]GB653569 (B B CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 28-40 *; | [A]EP0631003 (COLLIE CARPETS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2208159 (R E RUBBER COMPANY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13; | [A]US5238725 (EFFING MICHAEL J [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |