blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0807899

EP0807899 - Method and apparatus for reading a code on a code carrying means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SICK AG
Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch
Breisgau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
Sick AG
Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fowler, Tim
Rose Cottage, High Street
Church Eaton, Stafford ST200AG / GB
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/47]Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.)
Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97107820.913.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateDE1996101947914.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19619479
[1997/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0807899
Date:19.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0807899
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06K7/10
[1997/47]
CPC:
G06K7/10762 (EP,US); G06K7/10554 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Lesen eines auf einem Codeträger vorgesehenen Codes[1997/47]
English:Method and apparatus for reading a code on a code carrying means[1997/47]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour lire un code sur un porteur de code[1997/47]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/19]
05.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0610504  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * column 4, line 37 - line 40 * * column 9, line 18 - line 31 * * column 10, line 1 - line 12 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0326796  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 51 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]JPH01277980  ;
 [A]US4201910  (COPELAND JAMES S [US], et al) [A] 5,11 * column 2, line 36 - line 49 * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900130), vol. 014, no. 050, Database accession no. (P - 0998), & JP01277980 A 19891108 (NIPPON SHARYO SEIZO KAISHA LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.