EP0809283 - Method of treating wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuyama, Ryooji 236-14, Nishitoyoi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 02 /
Nawata, Makoto 1598-35 Nishitoyoi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 03 /
Kakehi, Yutaka 7-13-11, Nijigaoka Hikari-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 04 /
Kawahara, Hironobu 68-31, Wakamiya, Kochi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 05 /
Sato, Yoshiaki 1611-10, Nishitoyoi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 06 /
Torii, Yoshimi 1-3-17, Wakaba-Cho Tachikawa-Shi, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kawaraya, Akira 1507-2, Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | 08 /
Sato, Yoshie (nee Tanaka) 1611-10, Nishitoyoi Kudamatsu-Shi, Yamaguchi-Ken / JP | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97107985.0 | 20.08.1990 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | JP19890218523 | 28.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21852389 | JP19890284711 | 02.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28471189 | JP19900117596 | 09.05.1990 Original published format: JP 11759690 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0809283 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0809283 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/321, H01L21/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
C23F4/00 (EP,US);
Y10S438/906 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Scheiben | [1997/48] | English: | Method of treating wafers | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé de traitement de substrat | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90309106.4 / EP0416774 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0224360 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [X] 4,5 * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0305946 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 20, line 6 - line 41 * [Y] 2; | [PX]EP0345757 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * abstract *; | [E]EP0385590 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 4,5 * figures 2,3 *; | [E]EP0387097 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 4,5 * figure 1 *; | [Y] - HU C -K ET AL, "A PROCESS FOR IMPROVED AL(CU) REACTIVE ION ETCHING", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, (19890501), vol. 7, no. 3, PART 01, pages 682 - 685, XP000126080 [Y] 1-3 * page 683, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.575865 | [Y] - REICHERDERFER, "Single wafer processing", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY., WASHINGTON US, (198204), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 160 - 165, XP002049324 [Y] 1,3 * page 164, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | [A] - LEE ET AL, "Reactive ion etching induced corrosion of Al and Al-Cu films", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., NEW YORK US, (198104), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 2994 - 2999, XP002049325 [A] 1 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.329043 |