EP0814641 - Arrangement for transmitting electric energy from a furnace transformer to the electrodes of a three-phase electric furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KM Europa Metal Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3320 D-49023 Osnabrück / DE | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dratner, Christof, Dipl.-Ing. Altenburger Strasse 3 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [1997/52] | Application number, filing date | 97108078.3 | 17.05.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | DE1996121672 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621672 | [1997/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814641 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/11, H05B7/144, H05B7/103 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
H05B7/11 (EP,US);
F27D11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1997/52] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Übertragung der elektrischen Energie von einem Ofentransformator zu den Elektroden eines Drehstrom-Lichtbogenofens | [1997/52] | English: | Arrangement for transmitting electric energy from a furnace transformer to the electrodes of a three-phase electric furnace | [1997/52] | French: | Arrangement pour transmettre l'énergie électrique d'un transformateur de four aux électrodes d'un four à arc à courant triphasé | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0184140 (FUCHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-7; | [Y]DE4225256 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7; | [A]DE1565382 (ASEA AB) [A] 1,4,5 |