EP0809094 - Method for making a sensor device for temperature measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Electro-Nite International N.V. Centrum Zuid 1105 3530 Houthalen / BE | [1999/33] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states Heraeus Sensor-Nite GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wienand, Karlheinz Dr. Mudweg 4 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
Söll, Eve Koselstrasse 6 60318 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Muziol, Matthias Birkenweg 46 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108182.3 | 20.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | DE1996121001 | 24.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621001 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809094 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/18 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
G01K7/183 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49085 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49099 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Sensoranordung für die Temperaturmessung | [1997/48] | English: | Method for making a sensor device for temperature measurement | [1997/48] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un élément capteur pour la mesure de température | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/24] | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6082824 ; | [A]JPS58158980 ; | [AD]DE8716103U (DEGUSSA AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE29504105U (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850910), vol. 009, no. 224, Database accession no. (P - 387), & JP60082824 A 19850511 (TERUMO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831214), vol. 007, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 216), & JP58158980 A 19830921 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |