EP0810138 - Locking device for railway points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG (Siemens Suisse SA) (Siemens Svizzera SA) Siemens Switzerland Ltd) Postfach 8047 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG (Siemens Suisse SA) (Siemens Svizzera SA) Siemens Switzerland Ltd) Postfach 8047 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutweniger, Willy Rütiwisstrasse 16 8604 Volketswil / CH | 02 /
Koradi, Erich Riedhalden 7 8427 Freienstein / CH | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Siemens AG, Patentabteilung, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108198.9 | 21.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | CH19960001373 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: CH 137396 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810138 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810138 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/10 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B61L5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/49] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung für Eisenbahnweichen | [1997/49] | English: | Locking device for railway points | [1997/49] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour aiguilles de chemin de fer | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2906477 (TAKUJI UEDA) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2613738 (ABBAYE ATEL CONST) [A] 1-10* page 4, line 13 - page 9, line 10; figures 1-7 * |