EP0809046 - Gear-shifting device for an automatic transmission of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG 49448 Lemförde / DE | [2000/29] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states Lemförder Metallwaren AG 49448 Lemförde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Jörg Venusstrasse 3 49419 Wagenfeld / DE | [1997/48] | Application number, filing date | 97108242.5 | 21.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | DE1996120515 | 22.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19620515 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0809046 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0809046 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809046 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/02, // F16H59:04, F16H59:10 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0239 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0273 (EP,US);
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20067 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Schaltvorrichtung für ein Automatikgetriebe eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1997/48] | English: | Gear-shifting device for an automatic transmission of a motor vehicle | [1997/48] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse pour une transmission automatique d'un véhicule automobile | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4426207 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0413115 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3717675 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0624741 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] * column 1, line 21 - line 52; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4426207 | DE19526059 |