EP0814177 - Vaporizer apparatus and film deposition apparatus therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horie, Kuniaki Sanpia Odakyusakuragaoka 404, 1-15-2 Daikan, Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hidenao 1-4-28 Watauchi Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakada, Tsutomu 150-4-3-207 Hitorisawa, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kuriyama, Fumio No. 201, 2833-43 Totsuka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Murakami, Takeshi 3-9-8-302 Nakamagome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Abe, Masahito 1-9-2 Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Araki, Yuji 1-9-2 Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108312.6 | 22.05.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | JP19960151587 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15158796 | JP19960151588 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15158896 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814177 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814177 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/44, B01D1/22 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
B01D1/22 (EP,US);
C23C16/40 (KR);
C23C16/4481 (EP,US);
C23C16/4485 (EP,US);
Y10S261/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/52] | Title | German: | Verdampfer und Vorrichtung mit diesem Verdampfer zum Aufdampfen von Schichten | [1997/52] | English: | Vaporizer apparatus and film deposition apparatus therewith | [1997/52] | French: | Dispositif évaporateur et dispositif utilisant celui-ci pour la déposition de films | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0434966 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,13 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 3; figure 2 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US5356451 (CAIN MICHAEL B [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,13 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 31; figures 2-5 * [Y] 2; | [Y]WO9421840 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al) [Y] 2 * page 29, line 17 - page 33, line 4; figure 5 *; | [X]WO8707848 (SPECTRUM CONTROL INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * page 17, lines 3-27; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0548926 (TSUBOCHI KAZUO [JP]) [X] 13 * page 4, lines 4-28; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0299753 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [X] 13 * page 4, lines 6-34; figure 4 *; | [X]US5372754 (ONO HIROFUMI [JP]) [X] 13 * column 4, line 27 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,2 * |