EP0810589 - Optical pickup device with a plurality of laser couplers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Tadashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Chiaki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108319.1 | 22.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960154839 | 27.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15483996 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810589 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810589 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810589 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B7/125 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G11B7/127 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/123 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/131 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1356 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1359 (EP,US);
G11B11/10543 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/49] | G11B7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/49] | Title | German: | Optischer Kopf mit einer Mehrzahl von Laserkopplern | [1997/49] | English: | Optical pickup device with a plurality of laser couplers | [1997/49] | French: | Tête optique à plusieurs coupleurs laser | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02025650.9 / EP1293973 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5247167 (BARGERHUFF RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,27,32 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0630002 (NOGATECH LTD [IL]) [X] 1,6,27,32 * figures 3,6; claims 11-13 *; | [A]EP0550036 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,27,32 * figure 8; claims 8,9 *; | [A]JPH05145197 ; | [A]JPS6484687 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930922), vol. 017, no. 528, Database accession no. (E - 1437), & JP05145197 A 19930611 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890717), vol. 013, no. 312, Database accession no. (E - 788), & JP01084687 A 19890329 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | Examination | EP0470807 | EP0372365 | JPH01154326 | JPH02192044 | EP0545905 |