Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3087653B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2000 | B2 | JPH09320274 | 12.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0809359 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2003 | B1 | EP0809359 | 26.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69724696T | 15.07.2004 | T2 | DE69724696D1 | 16.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100332011B | 27.09.2002 | B1 | KR970076814 | 12.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW360868B | 11.06.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6037815 | 14.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15309396 | 24.05.1996 |