EP0809359 - Pulse generating circuit having address transition detecting circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togami, Tetsuji NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108376.1 | 23.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | JP19960153093 | 24.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15309396 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809359 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809359 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/1534, G11C8/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
H03K5/1534 (EP,US);
G11C8/00 (KR);
G11C8/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | Impulsgeneratorschaltung mit Detektorschaltung für Adressenumwandlung | [1997/48] | English: | Pulse generating circuit having address transition detecting circuit | [1997/48] | French: | Circuit générateur d'impulsions avec circuit de détection pour transition d'adresse | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0624878 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 35, line 17 - column 39, line 19; figures 38-41,43 * [A] 2-6,8; | [A]US4730131 (SAUER DONALD J [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 27 - column 8, line 32; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5465062 (FONG VINCENT L [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5343090 (PROEBSTING ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US5313422 (HOUSTON THEODORE W [US]); | [A]US4633102 (CHILDERS JIMMIE D [US]) |