EP0810176 - Group-controlled elevator system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hattori, Kazuhiro 2-13-4-3-103 Chuorinkan Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Atsunori 1011-3-A Maginu, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108632.7 | 28.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960134030 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13403096 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810176 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810176 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/20 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B66B1/2458 (EP,US);
B66B2201/104 (EP,US);
B66B2201/301 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/49] | Title | German: | Aufzugssystem mit Gruppensteuerung | [1997/49] | English: | Group-controlled elevator system | [1997/49] | French: | Système d'ascenseurs avec contrôle de groupe | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4357997 (HUSSON ALAN L, et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 52 * * column 2, line 65 - line 68 * * column 3, line 28 - line 31 * * figure 1; claims 1,2,8,9 *; | [A]US4792019 (BITTAR JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 13 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5480006 (KAMELI NADER [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 22 - line 29 * |