EP0810046 - Coated cores and metal casting therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brush Wellman Inc. 17876 St.Clair Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44110 / US | For all designated states Howmet Cercast (Canada) Inc. 3905 Industrial Boulevard Montreal North WC H1H 2Z2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Brush Wellman Inc. 17876 St.Clair Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44110 / US | ||
For all designated states Howmet Cercast (Canada) Inc. 3905 Industrial Boulevard Montreal North WC H1H 2Z2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grensing, Fritz 632 Indian Wells Lane Perrysberg, Ohio 43551 / US | 02 /
Tombari, Robert 153 Hilton Drive Dollard Des Ormeaux QC H9B 2P9 / CA | 03 /
Kennerknecht, Steven 629 Les Erables Laval sur le Lac QC H7R 1B3 / CA | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 97108688.9 | 30.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | US19960655867 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 655867 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810046 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B22C3/00, B22D21/00 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B22C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/23] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beschichtete Form zur Herstellung von Metall-Gussteil | [1997/49] | English: | Coated cores and metal casting therewith | [1997/49] | French: | Noyaux avec revêtement pour le moulage d'objets en métal | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 04.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.1997 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1090483 ; | [A]US4947927 (HORTON ROBERT A) [A] 1-17 * whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 50, Database accession no. 84-311590, XP002039778 & SU1090483 A 19840507 (CHELYABINSK POLY) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * |