EP0840366 - Method of forming a phosphorus doped silica glass film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON SALES CO., INC. 11-28, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS LABORATORY CO., LTD. 13-29, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states CANON SALES CO., INC. 11-28, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS LABORATORY CO., LTD. 13-29, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokumasu, Noboru c/o Semiconductor Process Laboratory Co., Ltd. 13-29, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Kazuo c/o Semiconductor Process Laboratory Co., Ltd. 13-29, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Marx, Lothar, Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108763.0 | 02.06.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | JP19960288787 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: JP 28878796 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840366 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840366 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840366 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
C23C16/401 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02129 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02145 (KR);
H01L21/02271 (EP,US);
H01L21/02337 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/31625 (US);
H01L21/324 (KR);
H01L21/02126 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/19] | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethode eines Phosphor-gedopten Silica-Glasfilms | [1998/19] | English: | Method of forming a phosphorus doped silica glass film | [1998/19] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une couche de silica dopée par phosphore | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0339385 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,11,12 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 15 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 9 *; | [A]EP0562625 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 35 ** page 7, line 22 - line 28; table . *; | [A]EP0624660 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,3-6,9-11 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 43; claims 1,2,4,5 * |