EP0812982 - Fuel injection control apparatus of an electronic controlled diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Yoshiyasu c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/51] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108796.0 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19960149409 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14940996 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0812982 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0812982 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812982 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/40, F02D41/06 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
F02D41/408 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02D2250/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/12] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzungssteuergerät für einen elektronisch geregelten Dieselmotor | [1997/51] | English: | Fuel injection control apparatus of an electronic controlled diesel engine | [1997/51] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'injection de carburant pour moteur diesel commandé électroniquement | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 09.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0684372 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - column 6, line 9 * * figures 5,9 *; | [Y]EP0697511 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 52 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4785771 (IBUKI NORITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * figure 5 *; | [A]JPS59147831 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841218), vol. 008, no. 276, Database accession no. (M - 346), & JP59147831 A 19840824 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |