EP0814611 - Communication system and method for recording and managing digital images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattes, Heinz, Dr. Otto-Wels-Strasse 7 81739 München / DE | [1997/52] | Application number, filing date | 97108926.3 | 03.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | DE1996124128 | 17.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19624128 | [1997/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814611 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814611 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814611 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N1/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04M3/4938 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/2166 (EP,US);
H04N2007/145 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3209 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3254 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3261 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/52] | H04N7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/15] |
Former [2001/12] | |||
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem und Verfahren zur Aufnahme und Verwaltung digitaler Bilder | [1997/52] | English: | Communication system and method for recording and managing digital images | [1997/52] | French: | Méthode et système de communication pour l'enregistrement et la gestion d'images numériques | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.02.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 07.02.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 07.02.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 07.02.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2646039 (GEOSTOCK [FR]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06133081 ; | [A]JPH06268582 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940810), vol. 018, no. 428, Database accession no. (E - 1591), & JP06133081 A 19940513 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941220), vol. 018, no. 675, Database accession no. (E - 1648), & JP06268582 A 19940922 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1,16 * abstract * | Examination | EP0624968 | WO9705738 |