EP0811977 - Semiconductor memory device having sense amplifier drivers disposed on center portion of cell array block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elpida Memory, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Elpida Memory, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | |||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Minari NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109136.8 | 05.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960146111 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14611196 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811977 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811977 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811977 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/02, G11C7/06, G11C11/409 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G11C5/025 (EP,US);
G11C11/40 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/50] | G11C5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung mit im Zentrum des Zellenarrayblocks befindlichen Leseverstärkertreibern | [1997/50] | English: | Semiconductor memory device having sense amplifier drivers disposed on center portion of cell array block | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur ayant des circuits d'attaque d'amplificateurs de lectures disposés au centre du bloc de réseau de cellules | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0461313 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US5406526 (SUGIBAYASHI TADAHIKO [JP], et al) |