Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0811977
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.02.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
04.03.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] |
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
24.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.12.2001 |
First examination report |
|
04.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.04.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
14.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] |
20.08.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
20.08.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
14.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.10.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |