Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3141923B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2001 | B2 | JPH09331039 | 22.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0811977 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2005 | B1 | EP0811977 | 06.10.1999 | A3 | EP0811977 | 10.12.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69733042T | 02.03.2006 | T2 | DE69733042D1 | 25.05.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100289623B | 02.05.2001 | B1 | KR980004971 | 30.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW419660B | 21.01.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5761142 | 02.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14611196 | 07.06.1996 |