EP0812833 - Water soluble triazole derivatives and their use as blowing inhibitor in chemical embossing processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armstrong World Industries, Inc. 2500 Columbia Avenue Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Armstrong World Industries, Inc. 2500 Columbia Avenue Lancaster Pennsylvania 17603 / US | ||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states Armstrong World Industries, Inc. P.O. Box 3001 Liberty and Charlotte Streets Lancaster Pennsylvania 17604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sideman, Carl E. 204 Buckfield Drive Lititz, PA 17543 / US | 02 /
Snyder, Donald, M. 1125 Heritage Drive Saline, MI 48176 / US | [1998/05] |
Former [1997/51] | 01 /
Side, Carl E. 204 Buckfield Drive Lititz, PA 17543 / US | ||
02 /
Snyder, Donald, M. 1125 Heritage Drive Saline, MI 48176 / US | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109158.2 | 05.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | US19960658511 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: US 658511 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812833 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812833 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/00, C07D249/18, C08J9/00, C09D11/02, D06N7/00 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C07D249/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/0028 (EP,US);
D06N7/0015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Triazolderivate und ihre Verwendung als Treibmittelinhibitoren in chemischen Prägeverfahren | [1997/51] | English: | Water soluble triazole derivatives and their use as blowing inhibitor in chemical embossing processes | [1997/51] | French: | Dérivés de triazole hydrosolubles et leur utilisation comme inhibiteurs d'agents d'expansion dans des procédés de gaufrage chimique | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9607670 (SURFACE ENG TECH [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1514359 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1511593 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US4464276 (SUNG RODNEY L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column W *; | [X]GB1466558 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5169435 (SHERMAN SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 14 * column W *; | [X]US5441563 (SIDEMAN CARL E [US], et al) [X] 14 * column W * |