EP0813905 - Perfume containing desiccant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH Postfach 12 53 37601 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH Postfach 12 53 D-37601 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wrede, Wolfgang Danziger Strasse 15 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
Kochta, Joachim, Dr. Weissdornweg 6 37603 Holzminden / DE | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109184.8 | 06.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | DE1996124419 | 19.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19624419 | [1997/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0813905 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0813905 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/26, B01D53/26, B01J20/04 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/045 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/264 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01D2253/202 (EP,US);
B01J2220/46 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/52] | B01J20/26, B01D53/26 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1997/52] | Title | German: | Riechstoff-enthaltendes Trockenmittel | [1997/52] | English: | Perfume containing desiccant | [1997/52] | French: | Produit déshydratant contenant un parfum | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58138461 ; | [A]JPH06165907 ; | [A]JPS6372339 ; | [A]JPH06319990 ; | [A]GB716882 (MARCHON PRODUCTS LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB1304086 (ICI) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 39, Database accession no. 83-773086, XP002052405 & JPS58138461 A 19830817 (KOBAYASHI KORYO) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 18, no. 495, Database accession no. (C - 1250), & JP06165907 A 19940614 (OSAKA SEIYAKU) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 299, Database accession no. (C - 520), & JP63072339 A 00000000 (TOYO KAGAKU YAKUHIN) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 2, & JP06319990 A 00000000 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO) [A] 1 * abstract * |