EP0819633 - Device for separating articles from piles of horizontally lying sacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher Münsterstrasse 50 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhn, Uwe Heitkamp 17 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [1998/04] | Application number, filing date | 97109264.8 | 07.06.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE1996127158 | 05.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627158 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819633 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819633 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H83/00, B65H3/08 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
B65H29/66 (EP);
B65H29/006 (EP);
B65H3/0858 (EP);
B65H5/24 (EP);
B65H2301/41922 (EP);
B65H2301/4233 (EP);
B65H2701/191 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/04] | B65H3/42, B65H83/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2002/05] |
Former [1999/49] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln von Stapeln aus flachliegenden Säcken | [1998/04] | English: | Device for separating articles from piles of horizontally lying sacks | [1998/04] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer des articles de piles consistants en sacs placés horizontalement | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE2732591 (FERAG) [DY] 1,2; | [DY]EP0054735 (WINDM¯LLER & H¯LSCHER) [DY] 1,2 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [Y] 1,2 |