Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4043067B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2008 | B2 | JPH10187999 | 21.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0851684 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2006 | B1 | EP0851684 | 23.02.2000 | A3 | EP0851684 | 01.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1156170C | 30.06.2004 | C | CN1186397 | 01.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69736798T | 09.08.2007 | T2 | DE69736798D1 | 23.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN192563 | 01.05.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100212552B | 02.08.1999 | B1 | KR19980051718 | 25.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6163627 | 19.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19960070632 | 23.12.1996 |