EP0884214 - Seat with a headrest including a gas generator for an airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kendrion RSL Germany GmbH Dr.-Paul-Müller-Strasse 36 57368 Lennestadt / DE | [1999/46] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states R. SCHMIDT GMBH Dr. Paul-Müller-Strasse 36 57368 Lennestadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Reinhard Dr.-Paul-Müller-Strasse 36 57368 Lennestadt / DE | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109694.6 | 13.06.1997 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884214 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884214 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/48, B60R21/22 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
B60R21/207 (EP,US);
B60N2/809 (EP,US);
B60N2/859 (EP,US);
B60N2/868 (EP,US);
B60N2/879 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/34] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sitz mit einer Kopfstütze, die ein integriertes Gaskissen einer Airbageinrichtung enthält | [1998/51] | English: | Seat with a headrest including a gas generator for an airbag | [1998/51] | French: | Siège avec un appui-tête qui comporte un générateur de gaz pour airbag | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.03.2003 | GB | 05.03.2003 | IT | 05.03.2003 | SE | 05.06.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 05.03.2003 | |
GB | 05.03.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 05.03.2003 | |
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 05.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29601798U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11,12 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 5; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,9,10; | [YA]US5324071 (GOTOMYO YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 18,28 * [A] 1; | [YA]DE19505216 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,5,12; | [XA]DE19614314 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,11,12 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 26; figures 2,3 * [A] 9,10; | [E]DE19622662 (SCHMIDT GMBH R [DE]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2062306 (OLIN CORP) [A] 1,7,11,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2841729 (SACHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,11,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5615909 (WIPASURAMONTON PONGDET P [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4231523 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4218252 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5505487 (BROWN LOUIS R [US], et al) [A] 1,9,12 * figure 1 *; | [AD]DE9415511U (SCHMIDT GMBH R [DE]) [AD] 1,2,5,9,10,12 * the whole document * |