Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1066143 | Global Dossier | 06.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US66460996 | 18.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0814623 | Global Dossier | 30.09.1998 | A3 | EP0814623 | 29.12.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66460996 | 18.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2198795 | 18.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66460996 | 18.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1171706 | 28.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US66460996 | 18.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9704472 | 31.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US66460996 | 18.06.1996 |