EP0814623 - Mobile decision methodology for accessing multiple wireless data networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durant, Gregory M. 814 Stelle Avenue Union, New Jersey 07063 / US | 02 /
Russell, Jesse Eugene 2 Thames Ave Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | 03 /
Schroeder, Robert Edward 18 Lenox Court Montville, New Jersey 07045 / US | 04 /
Wallace, Edward L. 615 Cameron Road South Orange, New Jersey 07079 / US | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109780.3 | 16.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | US19960664609 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: US 664609 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814623 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814623 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04L12/28, H04L12/66, H04L29/06 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/23] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entscheidungsverfahren bei mobilen Geräten zum Zugriff auf mehrere drahtlose Datennetze | [1997/52] | English: | Mobile decision methodology for accessing multiple wireless data networks | [1997/52] | French: | Méthode de décision en radio mobile pour l'accès à différents réseaux de données sans fil | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 12.05.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]TW256974B (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0684714 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 2,6,12,16 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, line 48 - line 55 *; | [X]GB2290925 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-13,16-19 * page 6, line 11 - page 9, line 9 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9605709 (PACIFIC COMM SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 9,10,19* page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 8 *; | [PLX]EP0724371 (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC [GB]) [PLX] 1,3-5,7,8,10,11,13-15,17,18 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - COLL D C ET AL, "THE COMMUNICATONS SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE OF THE NORTH AMERICAN ADVANCED TRAIN CONTROL SYSTEMS", WORLD PROSPERITY THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS, BOSTON, JUNE 11 - 14, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890611), VOL. 2, no. -, pages 932 - 937, XP000075263 [A] 9,10,19 * the whole document * |