EP0826994 - Integrated optical device having at least an optical filter and a mirror, and a method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Long 5122 Seaside Court Union City, CA 94587 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109868.6 | 17.06.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | US19960705872 | 28.08.1996 Original published format: US 705872 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826994 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0826994 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826994 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G02B6/34, G02B6/28, G02B27/62, G02B7/18 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/29362 (EP,US);
G02B6/29367 (EP,US);
G02B6/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/48] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte optische Vorrichtung, die aus mindestens einem optischen Filter und einem Spiegel besteht, sowie ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/10] | English: | Integrated optical device having at least an optical filter and a mirror, and a method of making the same | [1998/10] | French: | Dispositif d'optique intégrée avec au moins un filtre optique et un miroir, et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06148470 ; | [A]EP0640853 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 40; figure 17 *; | [A]US4767171 (KEIL RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940824), vol. 018, no. 454, Database accession no. (P - 1791), & JP06148470 A 19940527 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,7 * abstract * |