EP0801517 - Illuminated switch unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanabe, Koji 48-7, Kuraji 3-chome Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Chikahisa, Yosuke 5-6-301, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Ikoma, Heiji 3-14, Miyuki Higashi-machi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Ohara, Masahiro 13-2, Kisaichiyamate 3-chome Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Kuwahara, Masaru C35-302, 13-1, Korigaoka 6-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97109902.3 | 11.07.1996 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | JP19950178490 | 14.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17849095 | JP19950178499 | 14.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17849995 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801517 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801517 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/12, H01H13/02, H01H9/16 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H05B33/00 (EP,US);
H01H13/702 (EP,US);
H05B33/10 (EP,US);
H05B33/12 (EP,US);
H05B33/28 (EP,US);
H10K59/8051 (EP);
H01H2219/018 (EP,US);
H01H2219/028 (EP,US);
H01H2219/046 (EP,US);
H01H2221/05 (EP,US);
H10K2102/102 (EP,US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K59/8723 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/42] | Title | German: | Beleuchteter Schalter | [1997/42] | English: | Illuminated switch unit | [1997/42] | French: | Interrupteur éclairé | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/18] | 25.12.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96305101.6 / EP0753985 | Divisional application(s) | EP99124542.4 / EP0996313 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6086716 ; | [A]JPH04192231 ; | [A]JPH02148633 ; | [A]JPH01255118 ; | [A]US4320268 (BROWN ROBERT E) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - line 55; figure 2 *; | [X]US4532395 (ZUKOWSKI RAYMOND W [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 39; figure 2 *; | [E]WO9630919 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1,4,6 * abstract *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 26, Database accession no. 85-155611, XP002042904 & JPS6086716 A 19850516 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921022), vol. 016, no. 513, Database accession no. (E - 1283), & JP04192231 A 19920710 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900824), vol. 014, no. 394, Database accession no. (E - 0969), & JP02148633 A 19900607 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890110), vol. 014, no. 009, Database accession no. (E - 870), & JP01255118 A 19891012 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |