EP0814395 - Overcurrent sensing circuit for power mos field effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosokawa, Akio NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97109957.7 | 18.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | JP19960161744 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16174496 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814395 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814395 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
G01R19/0092 (EP,US);
G01R31/2621 (EP,US);
G01R31/2644 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H02M1/0009 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1999/27] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Überstrommessungsvorrichtung für Leistungs-MOS-Feldeffekttransistor | [1997/52] | English: | Overcurrent sensing circuit for power mos field effect transistor | [1997/52] | French: | Circuit de détection de surintensité pour transistor MOS de puissance à effet de champ | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5473276 (THRONGNUMCHAI KRAISORN [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0326968 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5497285 (NADD BRUNO C [FR]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0499921 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |