EP0815966 - Device for the crossed displacement of rolling rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drigani, Fausto Piazza della Chiesa, 6 33050 Zugliano-Pozzuolo, Del Friuli (UD) / IT | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 97110110.0 | 20.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | IT1996UD00110 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: IT UD960110 | [1998/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815966 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815966 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/02, B21B31/30 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B21B31/30 (EP,US);
B21B13/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Walzenkreuzvorrichtung für Walzwerk | [1998/02] | English: | Device for the crossed displacement of rolling rolls | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif de croisement de cylindres pour un laminoir | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.11.2001 | CH | 21.11.2001 | FI | 21.11.2001 | GR | 21.11.2001 | LI | 21.11.2001 | NL | 21.11.2001 | SE | 21.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | AT | 20.06.2002 | GB | 20.06.2002 | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 21.11.2001 | |
CH | 21.11.2001 | ||
FI | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
LI | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
AT | 20.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | BE | 21.11.2001 | |
CH | 21.11.2001 | ||
FI | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
LI | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
AT | 20.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 21.11.2001 | |
CH | 21.11.2001 | ||
FI | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
LI | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 21.11.2001 | |
FI | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
LI | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 21.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0623410 ; | [A]GB315088 (ROUX JACQUES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE724985 (RUDOLF LAQUAY) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE730405 (RUDOLF LAQUAY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1248599 (HEINRICH SCHULTE) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0525552 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,3,6 * column 4 - column 8; figures 1-6 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940425), vol. 018, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 1597), & JP06023410 A 19940201 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * |