EP0814626 - Mobile communication system for supporting multiple simultaneous communications on single mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakashima, Akiko c/o Int. Prop. Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 1-11 Nagatcho-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru 5-6-201 Nishibori 3-chome Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o Int.Prop.Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 1-11 Nagatcho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kaiyama, Akira Ikoinomachi-A 409, 4-1 Noukenndai 4-chome Kanazawa-ku, Kanagawa / JP | [2005/20] |
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
Nakashima, Akiko 17-8-208, Honchou 2-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru 5-6-201 Nishibori 3-chome Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o Int.Prop.Dep. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 1-11 Nagatcho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Kaiyama, Akira Ikoinomachi-A 409, 4-1 Noukenndai 4-chome Kanazawa-ku, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [1997/52] | 01 /
Nakashima, Akiko 17-8-208, Honchou 2-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru 5-6-201 Nishibori 3-chome Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko 22-3-302, Kosugaya 1-chome, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Kaiyama, Akira Ikoinomachi-A 409, 4-1 Noukenndai 4-chome Kanazawa-ku, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110136.5 | 20.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | JP19960161950 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16195096 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814626 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814626 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814626 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2000/21] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationssystem mit Fähigkeit zur mehreren gleichzeitigen Kommunikationen an einem Einzel-Endgerät | [1997/52] | English: | Mobile communication system for supporting multiple simultaneous communications on single mobile terminal | [1997/52] | French: | Système de communication mobile permettant des communications multiples simultanées avec un terminal mobile unique | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04022705.0 / EP1489864 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0583233 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,10,13 * column 6, line 52 - column 17, line 39 *; | [A]WO9533347 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1,13,17-19 * page 9, line 25 - page 16, line 11 * |