EP0815971 - Process for producing flat heat exchange tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Showa Denko K K 13-0, Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM CORPORATION 224, 6-cho Kaizan-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Daishi 828-1-201, Inuzuka Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | 02 /
Furuta, Masakazu 201-21, Oaza-Oyama Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Kazuyuki 398-6, Oaza-Inabago Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | 04 /
Osame, Yasuhiro 6-5-23-D-1, Joto Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110163.9 | 20.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960166165 | 26.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16616596 | JP19960166166 | 26.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16616696 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815971 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815971 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/15, F28F3/12 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
F28F3/048 (EP,US);
B21C37/151 (EP,US);
B21K25/00 (EP,US);
B23P15/26 (EP,US);
F28D1/0316 (EP,US);
F28F21/089 (EP,US);
F28F2250/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachröhren für Wärmetauscher | [1998/02] | English: | Process for producing flat heat exchange tubes | [1998/02] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de tubes plats pour échangeurs de chaleur | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121082.0 / EP1180403 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02290668 ; | [A]JPH0284252 ; | [A]EP0457470 (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5163602 (USUI MASAYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [AY]EP0617250 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910213), vol. 15, no. 61, Database accession no. (M - 1081), & JP02290668 A 19901130 (SANDEN CORP) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900615), vol. 14, no. 277, Database accession no. (M - 985), & JP02084252 A 19900326 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |