EP0816132 - Puncture preventive sealant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Akiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamagiwa, Toshio c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke, F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber, Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110316.3 | 24.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960168002 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16800296 | JP19960173333 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17333396 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816132 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816132 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B29D30/0685 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (KR);
B29C73/163 (EP,US);
B29C73/22 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0698 (EP,US);
B29L2023/245 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbstdichtungsmasse gegen Einstichverletzung | [1998/02] | English: | Puncture preventive sealant | [1998/02] | French: | Composition d'étanchéité obturant automatiquement les perforations | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR381166 (AI BERTRAM SHAW [US]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]US4137206 (KENT JERRY B) [A] 1 * column 6; claim - *; | [X]EP0045185 (HEMPEX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * example .; claim - *; | [X]EP0508669 (PACEMARK INC [US]) [X] 1 * example .; claim - * |