EP0818374 - Extruded profile with compressible damping inserts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinegger, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Grüttgasse 3 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Vogelbachstrasse 2 79410 Badenweiler / DE | [1998/03] | Application number, filing date | 97110368.4 | 25.06.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | EP19960810449 | 11.07.1996 Original published format: EP 96810449 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818374 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/18, B60R13/08, G10K11/16 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
B61D17/185 (EP);
G10K11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Strangpressprofil mit komprimierbaren Dämpfungseinlagen | [1998/03] | English: | Extruded profile with compressible damping inserts | [1998/03] | French: | Profilé extrudé avec des pièces intercalaires d'amortissement compressibles | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/28] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/28] | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9311001 (STANKIEWICZ GMBH) [X] 1,10 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,8; | [X]DE8707140U (H. PELZER) [X] 1,10 * page 7, line 10 - line 32; figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE3842890 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD ;IIDA INDUSTRY CO (JP)) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 1; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0610859 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 14 - column 7, line 10; figures 1-3,14 *; | [A]FR2407116 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |