EP0816017 - Method and apparatus for dressing polishing cloth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Norio 1-5-11-408 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, You 3-14-35-307 Katase Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Nishi, Toyomi 2-19-1302 Wakabadai, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawamoto, Takayoshi 1-6-3-205 Nakakaigan, Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Sakurai, Takeshi 85-8-A203 Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama.shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/02] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
Kimura, Norio 1-55-11-408 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ishii, You 3-14-35-307 Katase Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Nishi, Toyomi 2-19-1302 Wakabadai, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kawamoto, Takayoshi 1-6-3-205 Nakakaigan, Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Sakurai, Takeshi 85-8-A203 Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama.shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110400.5 | 25.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960184012 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: JP 18401296 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816017 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816017 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B53/00, B24B49/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B24B53/017 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B37/005 (EP,US);
B24B49/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abrichten eines Poliertuches | [1998/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for dressing polishing cloth | [1998/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de dressage d'une toile de polissage | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00113403.0 / EP1053828 | EP04007817.2 / EP1439031 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB907954 (CRANE PACKING CO) [A] 1,2,4,9,10 * page 1, line 69 - line 78 * * page 4, line 82 - line 104; figure 1 *; | [A]US4984390 (KOBAYASHI SHIGEO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column A *; | [A]EP0589434 (EBARA CORP [JP]); | [A]US5456627 (JACKSON PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,9,10 * column 3, line 3 - line 48; figure - *; | [A]US5486131 (CESNA JOSEPH V [US], et al) [A] 6,8 * column 1, line 27 - line 31 * * column 2, line 34 - line 53 * |