EP0816589 - Corner reinforcement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dätro-Handels-GmbH Buchenstrasse 11 72291 Betzweiler-Wälde / DE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110449.2 | 26.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996211225U | 27.06.1996 Original published format: DE 29611225 U | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816589 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816589 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/06 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
E04F13/06 (EP);
E04F13/068 (EP);
E04F2013/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1999/21] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eckarmierung | [1998/02] | English: | Corner reinforcement | [1998/02] | French: | Renforcement d'angle | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 05.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/31] | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5505032 (WASSERMAN JAMES J ET AL) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,10 * column 2, line 54 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE4128810 (GIMA GIPSER UND MALERBEDARF GM) [A] 1,2,6 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4490953 (MEOLA MICHAEL L) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 23; figures 4-9 * |