Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0816587 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0816587



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 255
30.08.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.09.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.08.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.05.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.05.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.05.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
09.09.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
31.07.2004 Description Search / examination 4
31.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
29.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
29.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
03.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.05.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
17.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
17.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
30.09.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
06.05.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
18.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
15.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
10.09.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.09.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
25.09.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
15.03.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.03.1999 European search report Search / examination 3
15.12.1998 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Request for accelerated search Search / examination 1
23.10.1998 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
30.09.1998 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
03.03.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.12.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.06.1997 Authorisation Search / examination 1
28.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
28.06.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.06.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 11
28.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 16
28.06.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
26.06.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.06.1997 Description Search / examination 10
26.06.1997 Drawings Search / examination 4
26.06.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.06.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
26.06.1997 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 18