blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0816587

EP0816587 - Prefabricated stairs bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HM-Betonfertigteilwerk Hans Mauthe GmbH & Co. KG
Hermann-Krum-Strasse 13
88319 Aitrach / DE
[2005/43]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
HM-Betonfertigteilwerk Hans Mauthe GmbH & Co. KG
Hermann-Krum-Strasse 13
88319 Aitrach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmelzer, Wilhelm
Schlossstrasse 7
87763 Lautrach / DE
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Pfister, Helmut
Pfister & Pfister
Patent-& Rechtsanwälte
Hallhof 6-7
87700 Memmingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]Pfister, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Herrenstrasse 11
87700 Memmingen / DE
Application number, filing date97110484.926.06.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateDE1996211241U27.06.1996         Original published format: DE 29611241 U
DE1996211766U08.07.1996         Original published format: DE 29611766 U
[1998/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0816587
Date:07.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0816587
Date:28.04.1999
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0816587
Date:26.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:E04F11/02
[1999/17]
CPC:
E04F11/022 (EP)
Former IPC [1998/02]E04F11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
Former [1998/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Auflager für eine Fertigtreppe aus Beton[1998/02]
English:Prefabricated stairs bearing[1998/02]
French:Support pour escalier préfabriqué[1998/02]
Examination procedure25.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
29.10.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.02.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT
07.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2005Fee for grant paid
12.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.11.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200004   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1683100  (KUEHL DIPL ING HANS, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * page 4, line 6 - line 9; figures 1,6,9; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]DE3916819  (THUMM & CO) [A] 1,5* figure 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [XA]EP0697489  (SCHOECK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-8 * figures 1-4; claims 1,12 * [A] 2
ExaminationDE29611766U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.