blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0817291

EP0817291 - Non-sintered nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery, alkaline storage battery including the same, and method for production of non-sintered nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yano, Mutsumi
1-32-30-105, Minamikuzuha
Hirakata, Osaka, 573 / JP
02 / Nogami, Mitsuzo
1-13-302-1206, Nasahara
Takatsuki, Osaka, 569 / JP
03 / Shinyama, Katsuhiko
7-23-6-902, Kanou
Higashiosaka, Osaka, 578 / JP
04 / Satoguchi, Kousuke
5-156, Higashibouji, Yamashirocho
Tokushima, Tokushima, 770 / JP
05 / Tokuda, Mitsunori
5-17-11, Yamasaka
Higashisumiyoshi, Osaka, Osaka, 546 / JP
06 / Yonezu, Ikuo
8-16-9, Korigaoka
Hirakata, Osaka, 573 / JP
07 / Nishio, Koji
2-5-20, Miyanosaka
Hirakata, Osaka, 573 / JP
08 / Inoue, Masao
7-1, Kunichiden
Otanicho, Tokushima, Tokushima, 770 / JP
09 / Fujitani, Shin
4-33, Kitakuzuha
Hirakata, Osaka, 573 / JP
[1998/02]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/02]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97110499.726.06.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateJP1996018658626.06.1996         Original published format: JP 18658696
JP1997005401621.02.1997         Original published format: JP 5401697
[1998/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0817291
Date:07.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0817291
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0817291
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/52, H01M4/32, H01M10/30
[1998/02]
CPC:
H01M4/32 (EP,KR,US); H01M4/52 (EP,US); Y02E60/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/04]
Former [2001/01](deleted) 
Former [1998/02]DE,  FI,  FR,  GB,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nicht gesinterte Nickelelektrode für alkalische Speicherbatterie, diese enthaltende alkalische Speicherbatterie und Herstellungsverfahren für solch eine Elektrode.[2003/15]
English:Non-sintered nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery, alkaline storage battery including the same, and method for production of non-sintered nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery[1998/02]
French:Electrode non-frittée de nickel pour pile alcaline, pile alcaline l'utilisant et méthode de fabrication d'une telle électrode[1998/02]
Former [1998/02]Nichtsinternickelelektrode für alkalische Speicherbatterie, diese enthaltende alkalische Speicherbatterie und Herstellungsverfahren für solch eine Elektrode
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
16.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2003Fee for grant paid
05.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.11.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   01.12.2000
27.11.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   01.12.2000
27.11.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.12.2000
27.11.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.12.2000
27.11.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.12.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0634804  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,9,11-15 * example 3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9614666  (OVONIC BATTERY CO [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.